EP0390276 - Partition wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polynorm n.v. Amersfoortseweg 9 3751 LJ Bunschoten / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states Polynorm N.V. Amersfoortseweg 9 NL-3751 LJ Bunschoten / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Riggelen René Albert Schweitzersingel 360 NL-3822 BZ Amersfoort / NL | 02 /
Heesbeen, Jan Dirk Pieter Waterhoen 8 NL-3752 ZJ Bunschoten / NL | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Konings, Lucien Marie Cornelis J., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Konings, Lucien Marie Cornelis Joseph, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 90200713.7 | 26.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | NL19890000762 | 28.03.1989 Original published format: NL 8900762 | [1990/40] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0390276 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390276 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/74, E04B1/61 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
E04B1/6183 (EP);
E04B2/7409 (EP);
E04B2002/7474 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/40] | Title | German: | Trennwand | [1990/40] | English: | Partition wall | [1990/40] | French: | Paroi de séparation | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 20.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.11.1992 | BE | 25.11.1992 | CH | 25.11.1992 | DE | 25.11.1992 | DK | 25.11.1992 | ES | 25.11.1992 | GR | 25.11.1992 | IT | 25.11.1992 | LI | 25.11.1992 | SE | 25.11.1992 | LU | 31.03.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 25.11.1992 | |
BE | 25.11.1992 | ||
CH | 25.11.1992 | ||
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
DK | 25.11.1992 | ||
GR | 25.11.1992 | ||
IT | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
LU | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 25.11.1992 | |
BE | 25.11.1992 | ||
CH | 25.11.1992 | ||
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
DK | 25.11.1992 | ||
IT | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 25.11.1992 | |
BE | 25.11.1992 | ||
CH | 25.11.1992 | ||
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
DK | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 25.11.1992 | |
BE | 25.11.1992 | ||
CH | 25.11.1992 | ||
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/33] | BE | 25.11.1992 | |
CH | 25.11.1992 | ||
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | CH | 25.11.1992 | |
DE | 25.11.1992 | ||
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | CH | 25.11.1992 | |
LI | 25.11.1992 | ||
SE | 25.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | CH | 25.11.1992 | |
LI | 25.11.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1898543 (THEODORE JOHNSON); | [A]DE1947191 (KNAUF WESTDEUTSCHE GIPS) | [A] - BOUWWERELD, vol. 77, no. 12, 5th June 1981, pages 51-53; "Universeel in woningbouw toepasbare scheidingswand" |