EP0392592 - Bleach activation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1990/42] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Kralingen, Cornelis Gerhard 10 Mountway, Waverton Chester, Cheshire / GB | 02 /
Martens, Rudolf Johan Oosterstraat 77 NL-3134 NN Vlaardingen / NL | 03 /
Rerek, Mark Edward 123 South Glenwood Road Fanwood, New Jersey 07023 / US | 04 /
Swarthoff, Ton Debussystraat 3 NL-3223 TE Hellevoetsluis / NL | 05 /
Van Vliet, Marten Robert Pieter Vergierdeweg 266 NL-2026 ZK Haarlem / NL | [1990/42] | Representative(s) | Bryant, Tracey, et al Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Bryant, Tracey, et al Unilever PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1990/42] | Tan, Bian An, Ir. Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 90200793.9 | 03.04.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | GB19890008416 | 13.04.1989 Original published format: GB 8908416 | [1990/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0392592 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0392592 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0392592 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/39 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
C11D3/3932 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/42] | Title | German: | Bleichaktivierung | [1990/42] | English: | Bleach activation | [1990/42] | French: | Activation de blanchiment | [1990/42] | Examination procedure | 12.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 14.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0124341 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [A]DE2054019 ; | [A]DE3002271 (WASCHMITTELWERK GENTHIN STAMMB [DD]); | [AD]US3532634 (WOODS WILLIAM G); | [AD]EP0272030 (INTEROX CHEMICALS LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0237111 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) |