EP0396204 - Method and device for joining well tubulars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/45] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heijnen, Wilhelmus Hubertus Paulus Marie Schepersmaat 2 NL-9405 TA Assen / NL | [1990/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1993/34] |
Former [1991/33] | Zeestraten, Albertus Wilhelmus Joannes, et al Shell International B.V. P.O. Box 384 NL-2501 CJ The Hague / NL | ||
Former [1991/30] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1990/45] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 90201122.0 | 03.05.1990 | [1990/45] | Priority number, date | GB19890010118 | 03.05.1989 Original published format: GB 8910118 | [1990/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0396204 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0396204 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0396204 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16L13/02, B23K20/12 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
F16L13/0236 (EP,US);
B23K20/129 (EP,US);
E21B17/08 (EP,US);
E21B19/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/45] | F16L13/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/45] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von Futterrohren | [1990/45] | English: | Method and device for joining well tubulars | [1990/45] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la connexion de tubes de cuvelage | [1990/45] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/45] | 09.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1505832 (WELDING INST); | [A]GB2161732 (WELDING INST) | [A] - WELDING JOURNAL. vol. 66, no. 7, 1987, MIAMI US pages 40 - 47; DUNKERTON ET AL: "Radial Friction Welding for Offshore Pipelines" |