EP0398430 - Electric shaver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Labrijn, Hans c/o Int. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1990/47] | Representative(s) | Gorter, Willem Karel, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/47] | Gorter, Willem Karel, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 90201204.6 | 14.05.1990 | [1990/47] | Priority number, date | NL19890001233 | 18.05.1989 Original published format: NL 8901233 | [1990/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0398430 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0398430 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/10, B26B19/26 | [1990/47] | CPC: |
B26B19/105 (EP,US);
B26B19/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/47] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Rasierapparat | [1990/47] | English: | Electric shaver | [1990/47] | French: | Rasoir électrique | [1990/47] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 04.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.01.1993 | [1997/17] |
Former [1993/38] | NL | 27.01.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2482509 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP0305778 (BRAUN AG [DE]); | [A]GB2199785 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]NL7504322 (PHILIPS NV) |