EP0399599 - Apparatus for making a tightly closed loop of a tape of thermoplastic material around an object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 18.05.1994 [1994/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1990/48] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horikx, Cornelis Martinus Stationsweg 4 NL-6971 BX Brummen / NL | 02 /
Jaspers, Martinus Jacobus Bloemhoefstraat 6 NL-5674 NZ Nuenen / NL | [1990/48] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/48] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 90201240.0 | 16.05.1990 | [1990/48] | Priority number, date | NL19890001314 | 25.05.1989 Original published format: NL 8901314 | [1990/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0399599 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/32, H05B6/80, B29C65/14 | [1990/48] | CPC: |
H05B6/80 (EP,US);
B65B13/02 (KR);
B29C65/1425 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/4322 (EP,US);
B29C66/4324 (EP,US);
B29C66/49 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/80 (EP,US);
B29C66/81417 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29C66/861 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/48] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum engen Umschliessen eines Gegenstandes mit einem Streifen thermoplastischen Materials | [1990/48] | English: | Apparatus for making a tightly closed loop of a tape of thermoplastic material around an object | [1990/48] | French: | Appareil pour faire une boucle fermée autour d'un article avec un ruban de matériau thermoplastique | [1990/48] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 09.04.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2149633 (THOMSON CSF); | [AD]US4265687 (MERCER PAUL W, et al); | [A]US2741296 (COLLINS FRED V); | [A]US3980855 (BOUDOURIS GEORGES, et al) |