EP0400751 - Electric discharge element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Gorkom, Gerardus Gegorius Petrus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Koppen, Jan, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 90201365.5 | 29.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | NL19890001390 | 01.06.1989 Original published format: NL 8901390 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0400751 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0400751 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/48, H01J3/02 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
H01J3/023 (EP);
H01J37/06 (EP,KR);
H01J31/124 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/49] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Entladungselement | [1990/49] | English: | Electric discharge element | [1990/49] | French: | Elément à décharge électrique | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 30.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/30] | 06.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.12.1995 | [2003/07] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63150835 ; | [X]US4069439 (ANDERSON CHARLES HAMMOND) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 412 (E-676)[3259], 31st October 1988; & JP-A-63 150 835 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) 23-06-1988, & JP63150835 A 00000000 | Examination | - The Microchannel Image Intensifier, Scientific American, vol. 245 (1981), Nov., No. 5, New York, USA |