EP0401923 - Washing machine with washing liquid recycling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCEAN S.p.A. Viale Europa, 5/7 25028 Verolanuova (Brescia) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/50] | For all designated states OCEAN S.p.A. Viale Europa, 5/7 I-25028 Verolanuova Brescia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spadoni, Giovanni Via Monte Capellano 18 I-19036 San Terenzo (La Spezia) / IT | [1990/50] | Representative(s) | Giambrocono, Alfonso Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing. Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B I-20129 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1990/50] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing. Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90201416.6 | 05.06.1990 | [1990/50] | Priority number, date | IT19890020806 | 07.06.1989 Original published format: IT 2080689 | [1990/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0401923 | Date: | 12.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08 | [1990/50] | CPC: |
D06F39/04 (EP,US);
D06F34/24 (EP,US);
D06F39/083 (EP,US);
D06F2103/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, SE [1990/50] | Title | German: | Waschmaschine mit einer Waschlaugenumwälzvorrichtung | [1990/50] | English: | Washing machine with washing liquid recycling device | [1990/50] | French: | Machine à laver avec dispositif à circulation du liquide lessiviel | [1990/50] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 12.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1406155 (TAPPAN CO); | [A]FR2554467 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]); | [AP]DE3820409 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) |