EP0402979 - Electrophotographic recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.1991 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.1992 [1992/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Terrell, David Richard Diependaele 4 B-2548 Lint / BE | 02 /
De Meutter, Stefaan Karel Schildebaan 22 B-2240 Zandhoven / BE | [1990/51] | Application number, filing date | 90201422.4 | 05.06.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | EP19890201573 | 16.06.1989 Original published format: EP 89201573 | [1990/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0402979 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03G5/06 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
G03G5/0582 (EP);
G03G5/0564 (EP);
G03G5/0596 (EP);
G03G5/0696 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/51] | Title | German: | Elektrophotographisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [1990/51] | English: | Electrophotographic recording material | [1990/51] | French: | Matériau d'enregistrement électrophotographique | [1990/51] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 20.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/07] | 17.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2074539 ; | [A]DE2108963 ; | [A]EP0237953 ; | [A]JPS63142356 ; | [A]JPS63286857 ; | [A]JPS61105550 ; | [A]JPS62182744 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 401 (P-776)(3248) 25 October 1988& JP-A-63 142356 (SEIKO EPSON) 14 June 1988, | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 108 (P-843)(3456) 15 March 1989& JP-A-63 286857 (FUJI) 24 November 1988, | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 284 (P-501)(2340) 26 September 1986& JP-A-61 105550 (FUJI) 11 August 1987, | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 122, no. 9 (P-660)(2876) 28 January 1988& JP-A-62 182744 (MITSUBISHI) 11 August 1987, |