EP0404252 - Improved drying machine, in particular for drying washing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OCEAN S.p.A. Viale Europa, 5/7 25028 Verolanuova (Brescia) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states OCEAN S.p.A. Viale Europa, 5/7 I-25028 Verolanuova Brescia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spadoni, Giovanni Via Monte Capellano, 18 I-19036 San Terenzo (La Spezia) / IT | [1990/52] | Representative(s) | Faraggiana, Vittorio Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | Faraggiana, Vittorio, Dr. Ing. Ingg. Guzzi & Ravizza S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Monti 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90201583.3 | 18.06.1990 | [1990/52] | Priority number, date | IT19890021304U | 23.06.1989 Original published format: IT 2130489 U | [1990/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0404252 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/08, D06F58/06 | [1990/52] | CPC: |
D06F58/08 (EP,US);
D06F58/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, SE [1990/52] | Title | German: | Trockenmaschine, insbesondere für Wäsche | [1990/52] | English: | Improved drying machine, in particular for drying washing | [1990/52] | French: | Machine à sécher, en particulier du linge | [1990/52] | File destroyed: | 15.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/09] | 02.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2803142 (KAUFFMAN II WALTER L); | [X]US2486058 (PATTERSON GLENN A, et al); | [X]DE1954053 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE); | [X]US2552855 (JOHNSTON WILLIAM A); | [X]US3651580 (MEYER ANFRIED); | [A]US3419969 (FREZE BENJAMIN H); | [A]FR1277351 |