EP0463239 - Photoimaging process using water removable coatings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weller, Edward L., Jr. 1959 Robin Crest Lane Glenview Illinois 60025 / US | For all designated states Weller, Edward L. III 205 Lake Drive South Algonquin, IL 60102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | For all designated states Weller, Edward L., Jr. 1959 Robin Crest Lane Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | ||
For all designated states Weller, Edward L. III 205 Lake Drive South Algonquin, IL 60102 / US | |||
Former [1992/01] | For all designated states Weller, Edward L., Jr. 1959 Robin Crest Lane Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | ||
For all designated states Renkor, Edward J. 2 N. 565 Pearl Avenue Glyn Ellyn, Illinois 60137 / US | |||
For all designated states Weller, Edward L. III 1959 Robin Crest Lane Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weller, Edward L., Jr. 1959 Robin Crest Lane Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | 02 /
Renkor, Edward J. 10714 Virginia Avenue Whittier, CA / US | 03 /
Weller, Edward L. III 205 Lake DriveSouth Algonquin, IL 60102 / US | [1998/10] |
Former [1992/01] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kuborn, Jacques, et al Office Hanssens S.P.R.L. Square Marie-Louise 40 Bte 19 1040 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/10] | Kuborn, Jacques, et al Office Hanssens S.P.R.L. Square Marie-Louise, 40 (bte 19) 1040 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1992/01] | van der Kloet-Dorleijn, Geertruida W.F., Drs., et al van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 90201667.4 | 22.06.1990 | [1992/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0463239 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03F3/10 | [1992/01] | CPC: |
G03F3/10 (EP,US);
Y10S430/136 (EP,US);
Y10S430/162 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/01] | Title | German: | Photographisches Bildaufzeichungsverfahren mit wasserentwickelbaren Schichten | [1992/01] | English: | Photoimaging process using water removable coatings | [1992/01] | French: | Procédé photographique utilisant un revêtement dépouillable avec de l'eau | [1992/01] | Examination procedure | 22.12.1990 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 05.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/03] | 26.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1995 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.1995 | 30.06.1998 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4748102 (WELLER JR EDWARD L [US], et al); | [X]US4710447 (KREITER MANNY [US]); | [X]EP0338786 (HOECHST CELANESE CORP [US]); | [Y]US3244518 (SCHWERIN ANDRE K, et al) |