EP0426209 - Improved cleaning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FILMOP S.N.C. Via Roncà 19 I-35010 Onara di Tombolo Padova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states FILMOP S.N.C. Via Roncà 19 I-35010 Onara di Tombolo Padova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zorzo, Roberto Via Roncà, 19 I-35010 Onara di Tombolo (Padova) / IT | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Robba, Eugenio, et al Studio "INTERPATENT" via Caboto 35 10129 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | Robba, Eugenio, et al Studio "INTERPATENT" via Caboto 35 I-10129 Turin / IT | Application number, filing date | 90201936.3 | 17.07.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | IT19890041754 | 28.11.1989 Original published format: IT 4175489 | [1995/17] |
Former [1991/19] | deleted | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0426209 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426209 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/258 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
A47L13/258 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1991/19] | Title | German: | Reinigungsgerät | [1991/19] | English: | Improved cleaning device | [1991/19] | French: | Instrument de nettoyage | [1991/19] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 15.02.1995 | ES | 15.02.1995 | NL | 15.02.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [1996/04] | BE | 15.02.1995 | |
NL | 15.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | NL | 15.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8509366U ; | [A]EP0150417 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [A]EP0175019 (FLOORDRESS REINIGUNGSGERAETE [DE]); | [A]DE8706126U ; | [A]EP0249353 (SCOT YOUNG SERV SYST LTD [GB]) |