EP0415470 - Aminopeptidase [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMPINA MELKUNIE B.V. Hogeweg 9 NL-5301 LB Zaltbommel / NL | For all designated states Rijksuniversiteit Groningen Broerstraat 5 9712 CP Groningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states CAMPINA MELKUNIE B.V. Hogeweg 9 NL-5301 LB Zaltbommel / NL | ||
For all designated states Rijksuniversiteit te Groningen Broerstraat 5 NL-9712 CP Groningen / NL | |||
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states DMV CAMPINA B.V. NCB-laan 80 NL-5462 GE Veghel / NL | ||
For all designated states Rijksuniversiteit te Groningen Broerstraat 5 NL-9712 CP Groningen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tan, Paris Som Tjwan Vinkenstraat 122a Nl-9713 TM Groningen / NL | 02 /
Konings, Wilhelmus Nicolaas Rijksstraatweg 236 Nl-9752 CJ Haren / NL | 03 /
Levering-Clement, Wendy Plecht 13 NL-5345 BT Oss / NL | 04 /
Zuurendonk, Peter Frederik Notelaar 8 NL-5467 BB Veghel / NL | [1991/10] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 90202098.1 | 01.08.1990 | [1991/10] | Priority number, date | NL19890001994 | 02.08.1989 Original published format: NL 8901994 | [1991/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0415470 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0415470 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0415470 | Date: | 04.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/52, C12N1/21, C12P21/08, C12N15/57, C12Q1/37, A23L1/03, C12P21/00, A23C19/032, A23L1/314, // (C12N9/52, C12R1:225) | [1991/10] | CPC: |
C12Y304/11011 (EP);
A23C19/0328 (EP);
A23J3/34 (EP);
A23L13/48 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP);
C12N9/48 (EP);
A23V2400/215 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/10] | Title | German: | Aminopeptidase | [1991/10] | English: | Aminopeptidase | [1991/10] | French: | Aminopeptidase | [1991/10] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/44] | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0286171 (UNIV GRONINGEN [NL]) | [A] - APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 31, no. 1, July 1989, pages 75-78, Springer-Verlag; B. KIEFER-PARTSCH et al.: "Purification of an X-prolyl-dipeptidyl aminopeptidase from the cell wall proteolytic system of Lactococcus lactic subsp. cremoris" | [A] - FEMS MICROBIOLOGY REVIEWS, vol. 46, 1987, pages 245-268, Elsevier, Amsterdam, NL; T.D. THOMAS et al.: "Proteolytic enzymes of dairy starter cultures" | [XP] - APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, vol. 56, no. 2, February 1990, pages 526-532, American Society for Microbiology; P.S.T. TAN et al.: "Purification and characterization of an aminopeptidase from Lactococcus lactis subsp. cremoris Wg2" |