EP0421538 - Funnel with piercing device for flowable product package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.08.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.10.1994 [1994/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bavegems, Guy Armand Louis Lelielaan 23 B-2970 Boortmeerbeek / BE | 02 /
Deflander, Joseph Fernand Elleveldweg 22 B-2990 Wespelaar / BE | 03 /
De Smet, Beatrijs Lutgarde Aloisia Forumlaan 15 bus 50 B-1020 Brussel / BE | 04 /
Heming, Rowland Stanley Wesley Place Louis Morichar 3 B-1060 Brussel / BE | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 90202603.8 | 01.10.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | GB19890022477 | 05.10.1989 Original published format: GB 8922477 | [1991/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0421538 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/00, B67D3/00 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
B67B7/26 (EP);
B65D47/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/15] | Title | German: | Fülltrichter mit Schneidwerkzeug für Flüssigproduktpackung | [1991/15] | English: | Funnel with piercing device for flowable product package | [1991/15] | French: | Trémie de remplissage à moyen de perçage pour emballage de liquide | [1991/15] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 04.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 18.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0369722 (DIVERSEY CORP [CA]); | [X]US4723688 (MUNOZ EDWARD A [US]) |