EP0427335 - An aqueous process for the preparation of 5-methyl-N-(aryl)-1,2,4-triazolo (1,5-a)pyrimidine-2-sulfonamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2000 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences, LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US | ||
Former [1991/20] | For all designated states DOWELANCO 4040 Vincennes Circle Indianapolis, Indiana 46268-3030 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Kay K. 15 Wyllys Court Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | 02 /
Krauss, Richard C. 2716 Plymouth Street Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | 03 /
Orvik, Jon A. 608 Crescent Drive Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 90202920.6 | 05.11.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | US19890432241 | 06.11.1989 Original published format: US 432241 | [1991/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427335 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0427335 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, // C07D249/14, A01N43/90 ,(C07D487/04, 249:00, 239:00) | [1991/20] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1991/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 5-Methyl-N-(aryl)-1,2,4-triazol(1,5-a)pyrimidin-2-sulfonamiden in Gegenwart von Wasser | [1991/20] | English: | An aqueous process for the preparation of 5-methyl-N-(aryl)-1,2,4-triazolo (1,5-a)pyrimidine-2-sulfonamides | [1991/20] | French: | Procédé aqueux pour la préparation de 5-méthyl-N-(aryl)-1,2,4-triazolo(1,5-a)pyrimidine-2-sulfonamides | [1991/20] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/01] | 24.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0142152 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [Y]EP0101517 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0332029 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [A]EP0244847 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) |