EP0429141 - Implantable pharmacological defibrillator with automatic recognition of ventricular fibrillation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cammilli, Leonardo Via G. Caselli 11 50131 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states Cammilli, Leonardo Via G. Caselli 11 I-50131 Florence / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cammilli, Leonardo Via G. Caselli 11 I-50131 Florence / IT | 02 /
Grassi, Gino Via Pasqui 31 I-50019 Sesto Fiorentino, Florence / IT | 03 /
Alcidi, Luciano Via Console 8 I-50141 Florence / IT | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Appoloni, Romano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.P.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Appoloni, Romano, et al ING. BARZANO' & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 90203059.2 | 17.11.1990 | [1991/22] | Priority number, date | IT19890009568 | 24.11.1989 Original published format: IT 956889 | [1991/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0429141 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0429141 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0429141 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39, A61N1/365, A61M5/142, A61M5/00, A61N1/375 | [1991/44] | CPC: |
A61M25/0075 (EP,US);
A61N1/365 (EP,US);
A61N1/3962 (EP,US);
A61N1/39622 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/22] | A61N1/39, A61N1/365, A61M5/142 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | Pharmakologischer implantierbarer Defibrillator mit automatischer Erkennung von Herzkammer-Flimmern | [1991/22] | English: | Implantable pharmacological defibrillator with automatic recognition of ventricular fibrillation | [1991/22] | French: | Défibrillateur pharmacologique implantable à détection automatique de fibrillations ventriculaires | [1991/22] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/20] | 20.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Request for further processing for: | 11.08.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 11.08.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.09.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4146029 (ELLINWOOD JR EVERETT H); | [A]EP0074126 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]); | [A]DE3506789 (BIOTRONIK MESS & THERAPIEG [DE]); | [A]EP0205737 (OSYPKA PETER) |