EP0432830 - Bale wrapping apparatus for round balers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND BELGIUM N.V. Leon Claeysstraat 3a B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states FORD NEW HOLLAND INC. 500 Diller Avenue P.O. Box 1895 New Holland Pennsylvania 17557-0903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Underhill, Kenneth R. 219 Miller Street Strasburg, PA 17579 / US | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic CNH Belgium N.V. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A 8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic New Holland Belgium NV. Patent Department Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | ||
Former [1991/25] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic T.J. New Holland Belgium NV., Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 90203166.5 | 30.11.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | US19890448404 | 11.12.1989 Original published format: US 448404 | US19890448405 | 11.12.1989 Original published format: US 448405 | US19890448406 | 11.12.1989 Original published format: US 448406 | [1991/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0432830 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0432830 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01F15/07, A01F15/08 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
A01F15/0715 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/25] | Title | German: | Ballenumwickelvorrichtung für Rundballenpressen | [1991/25] | English: | Bale wrapping apparatus for round balers | [1991/25] | French: | Appareil pour envelopper une balle dans une presse à balles rondes | [1991/25] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/07] | 06.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50] | Request for further processing for: | 10.07.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 10.07.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.08.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4604855 ; | [XD]US4790125 ; | [XD]US4729213 ; | [AD]US4870812 ; | [A]GB2137927 |