EP0431690 - Locking device for container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1992 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.1993 [1993/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DE ARK B.V. Gezellenstraat 21 NL-3861 RD Nijkerk / NL | [1991/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Pol, Aart Antonie Coltoflaan 10 NL-3862 AG Nijkerk / NL | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | de Bruijn, Leendert C., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 90203174.9 | 30.11.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | NL19890003019 | 07.12.1989 Original published format: NL 8903019 | [1991/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0431690 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/13, B61D45/00, B65D88/12 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
G11B19/02 (EP);
B60P7/13 (EP);
B61D45/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/24] | Title | German: | Verriegelungsvorrichtung für Container | [1991/24] | English: | Locking device for container | [1991/24] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage pour un conteneur | [1991/24] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/06] | 24.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/06] | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3262678 (HAND ALBERT M); | [A]DE1456673 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG); | [A]US4854791 (BROWN JAMES T [US]) |