EP0436987 - Electric overhead conductor with integrated optical communication line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.1996 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.05.1996 [1996/20] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
NL
AT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
NL
AT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindner, Helmut, Dr. Pfarrer Maybaum-Weg 8 W-5000 Köln 80 / DE | 02 /
Wenzel, Norbert, Dr. Friedrich-Rosengarth-Strasse 29 W-506 Bergisch Gladbach 1 / DE | 03 /
Herff, Robert Römerstrasse 30 W-5000 Köln 50 / DE | 04 /
Schmitz, Hans-Joachim Zum Mühlenfeld 2 W-5014 Kerpen 3 / DE | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Erdmann, Anton, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/21] | Erdmann, Anton, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1991/29] | Koch, Ingo, Dr.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Wendenstrasse 35c D-20097 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 90203401.6 | 18.12.1990 | [1991/29] | Priority number, date | DE19904000605 | 11.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4000605 | [1991/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0436987 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0436987 | Date: | 24.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01B5/08 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
H01B5/108 (EP,US);
D07B1/147 (EP,US);
G02B6/4416 (EP,US);
G02B6/4422 (EP,US);
G02B6/4423 (EP,US);
D07B2201/2096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/29] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Freileiterseil mit integrierter optischer Nachrichtenleitung | [1991/29] | English: | Electric overhead conductor with integrated optical communication line | [1991/29] | French: | Câble pour lignes électriques aériennes contenant une ligne de communication optique | [1991/29] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 29.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0347971 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al) |