EP0383419 - Orthopaedic fixator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.05.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 29.06.1994 [1994/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Professional Products GmbH Aspelohe 27a 22848 Norderstedt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Professional Products GmbH Aspelohe 27a D-22848 Norderstedt / DE | ||
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states MECRON MEDIZINISCHE PRODUKTE GMBH Nunsdorfer Ring 23-29 D-12277 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kranz, Curt, Dr. Ing. Kufsteiner Strasse 12 D-1000 Berlin 62 / DE | 02 /
Tetzner, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Skarbinastrasse 78 D-1000 Berlin 49 / DE | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1990/34] | Christiansen, Henning, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45 D-14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 90250045.3 | 14.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | DE19890001908U | 15.02.1989 Original published format: DE 8901908 U | [1990/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0383419 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/60 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
A61B17/645 (EP);
A61B17/6466 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI [1990/34] | Title | German: | Orthopädische Fixiereinrichtung | [1990/34] | English: | Orthopaedic fixator | [1990/34] | French: | Fixateur orthopédique | [1990/34] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 23.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/26] | 13.02.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]FR2405063 ; | [X]FR2393563 ; | [X]US4696293 ; | [Y]DE2928216 | [Y] - MEDIZINISCH-ORTHOPÄDISCHE TECNIK, Band 103, Nr. 3, Mai/Juni 1983, Seiten 79-82, Stuttgart, DE; Th. STUHLER: "Katastrophensituationen: Variationsmöglichkeiten eines Fixateur externe" |