EP0436256 - Switchgear with a gas-filled container and multi-position rotary switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/28] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Späck, Helmut Hohe Strasse 27 W-6050 Offenbach / DE | [1991/28] | Application number, filing date | 90250294.7 | 28.11.1990 | [1991/28] | Priority number, date | DE19904000258 | 04.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4000258 | [1991/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0436256 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0436256 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0436256 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/035 | [1991/28] | CPC: |
H02B13/035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/28] | Title | German: | Lastschaltanlage mit isoliergasgefülltem Behälter und Mehrstellungs-Drehschalter | [1991/28] | English: | Switchgear with a gas-filled container and multi-position rotary switch | [1991/28] | French: | Installation de commutation avec un récipient blindé à isolation gazeuse et interrupteur rotatif multiposition | [1991/28] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/28] | 10.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0059255 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE2847376 (SPRECHER & SCHUH AG) | [A] - SIEMENS POWER ENGINEERING Bd. 5, Nr. 3, Mai 1983, PASSAU DEUTSCHLAND REINHARD BUCHENAU ET AL.: 'NEW 8DJ10 MEDIUM-VOLTAGE LOAD-BREAK SWITCHGEAR FOR 6 TO 24 KV, MAINTENANCE-FREE AND CLIMATE-PROOF' |