EP0378293 - Liquid crystal display device and its driving method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [1990/29] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakita, Naohide 2-15-20-202, Shimoshinjou Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 533 / JP | 02 /
Iwai, Yoshio 5-7, Amashinmachi Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu 569 / JP | 03 /
Uemura, Tsuyoshi 16-3-321, Joushouji-cho Kadoma-shi Osaka-fu 571 / JP | 04 /
Ohnishi, Hiroyuki 8-4-203, Tateishi-cho Ikeda-shi Osaka-fu 563 / JP | 05 /
Johten, Kazuhiro 18-26-28, Okayamate-cho Hirakata-shi Osaka-fu 573 / JP | 06 /
Kimura, Satoshi 3-12-8, Sekime Joutouku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 536 / JP | 07 /
Fujiwara, Shozo 1-7-7, Shirakawa Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu 567 / JP | [1990/29] | Representative(s) | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300032.1 | 03.01.1990 | [1990/29] | Priority number, date | JP19890002422 | 09.01.1989 Original published format: JP 242289 | JP19890133442 | 26.05.1989 Original published format: JP 13344289 | [1990/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0378293 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0378293 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0378293 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36, G02F1/137 | [1991/32] | CPC: |
G09G3/3681 (EP,US);
G02F1/133 (KR);
G02F1/141 (EP,US);
G09G3/3629 (EP,US);
G09G3/3692 (EP,US);
G02F1/133512 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0205 (EP,US);
G09G2310/06 (EP,US);
G09G2310/061 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/29] | G02F1/137, G09G3/36 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1990/29] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristall-Anzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Ansteuerung | [1990/29] | English: | Liquid crystal display device and its driving method | [1990/29] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide et procédé pour le commander | [1990/29] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2578670 [ ] (CANON KK [JP]) |