EP0377502 - Integrated circuit capacitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. World Headquarters Dayton Ohio 45479 / US | For all designated states HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | For all designated states SYMBIOS LOGIC INC. 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins Colorado 80525 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/20] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. World Headquarters Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
For all designated states HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | |||
For all designated states SYMBIOS LOGIC INC. 2001 Danfield Court Fort Collins, Colorado 80525 / US | |||
Former [1995/21] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
For all designated states HYUNDAI ELECTRONICS AMERICA 510 Cottonwood Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | |||
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states AT&T GLOBAL INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states NCR INTERNATIONAL INC. 1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | ||
Former [1990/28] | For all designated states NCR CORPORATION World Headquarters Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Crafts, Harold S. 3243 Nelson Lane Fort Collins Colorado 80525 / US | 02 /
Scaggs, Mark Q. 1427 Wildwood Road Fort Collins Colorado 80521 / US | [1990/28] | Representative(s) | Gill, David Alan, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/02] | Gill, David Alan, et al W.P. Thompson & Co., Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [1995/21] | Gill, David Alan W.H. Beck, Greener & Co., 7 Stone Buildings, Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | ||
Former [1994/40] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department, AT&T GIS Limited, 915 High Road, North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | ||
Former [1990/28] | Robinson, Robert George International Patent Department NCR Limited 915 High Road North Finchley London N12 8QJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300066.9 | 04.01.1990 | [1990/28] | Priority number, date | US19890294154 | 06.01.1989 Original published format: US 294154 | [1990/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0377502 | Date: | 11.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0377502 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/94 | [1990/28] | CPC: |
H01L27/0688 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1990/28] | Title | German: | Kondensator für eine integrierte Schaltung | [1990/28] | English: | Integrated circuit capacitor | [1990/28] | French: | Condensateur pour circuit intégré | [1990/28] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 22.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP56153778 ; | [Y]EP0093818 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE], et al); | [Y]EP0171445 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 32 (E-96)[910], 26th February 1982; & JP-A-56 153 778 (TOKYO SHIBAURA) 27-11-1981, & JP56153778 A 00000000 |