EP0378336 - Naphthalocyanine derivatives, production thereof, optical recording medium using the same, and production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 160 / JP | ||
Former [1990/29] | For all designated states HITACHI CHEMICAL COMPANY LTD. 1-1, 2-chome, Nishishinjuku Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tai, Seiji Union Plaza Apartment 301 535, Arastradero Road Palo Alto California 94306 / US | 02 /
Hayashi, Nobuyuki 17-1, Suwacho-5-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 03 /
Kamijima, Koichi Yamasakiryo, 2-9 Higashicho-4-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 04 /
Akimoto, Takayuki Yamasakiryo, 2-9 Higashicho-4-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 05 /
Katayose, Mitsuo Yamasakiryo, 2-9 Higashicho-4-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 06 /
Hagiwara, Hideo Daiwa Haitsu 101, 9-4, Heiwacho-1-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | [1990/29] | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300185.7 | 08.01.1990 | [1990/29] | Priority number, date | JP19890003984 | 11.01.1989 Original published format: JP 398489 | [1990/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0378336 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0378336 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09B47/08, G11B7/24, C07D487/22 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
G11B7/248 (EP,US);
C09B47/045 (EP,US);
C09B47/08 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US);
Y10S430/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, LU, NL [1990/29] | Title | German: | Naphthalocyaninderivate, deren Herstellung, optisches Wiedergabe-Medium mit solchen Verbindungen und dessen Herstellung | [1990/29] | English: | Naphthalocyanine derivatives, production thereof, optical recording medium using the same, and production thereof | [1990/29] | French: | Dérivés de naphtalocyanine, leur préparation, milieu de reproduction optique utilisant ces dérivés et sa préparation | [1990/29] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 23.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4622179 [ ] (EDA TSUNEHITO [JP]); | EP0212907 [ ] (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]); | US4766054 [ ] (HIROSE SUMIO [JP], et al); | EP0296876 [ ] (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) | Examination | EP0279501 |