EP0379310 - Vehicle body structures and their manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. New Marunouchi Building Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuruda, Hitoshi 7-3, Touyou 4-chome Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi 744 / JP | 02 /
Hattori, Morishige 2-31, Kotohira-cho 2-chome Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi 744 / JP | 03 /
Okazaki, Masato 2-2 Hataoka 5-chome Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi 744 / JP | 04 /
Yamada, Hiroyuki 1598-35, Nishitoyoi Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi 744 / JP | 05 /
Kikumoto, Kiyotaka 1230, Ikunoya Sougasako Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi 744 / JP | 06 /
Watanabe, Takeyuki 2-3 Hataoka 5-chome Kudamatsu-shi, Yamaguchi 744 / JP | 07 /
Takayama, Ryoichi 777-626, Nakamura Shinseikoudai, Kumage-cho Kumage-gun, Yamaguchi 745-06 / JP | 08 /
Okuno, Sumio 1038-33, Kouchi Tanaka Kudamatus-shi, Yamaguchi 744 / JP | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1990/30] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS 2 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300329.1 | 11.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | JP19890007805 | 18.01.1989 Original published format: JP 780589 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0379310 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0379310 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379310 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B61D17/04, B61D17/00, B62D65/00, B62D31/02 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
B62D65/02 (EP,US);
B61D17/04 (KR);
B21C23/142 (EP,US);
B21C35/023 (EP,US);
B21C35/026 (EP,US);
B61D17/041 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/30] | B61D17/04, B62D31/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/30] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug-Aufbaustrukturen und Herstellungsweise | [1990/30] | English: | Vehicle body structures and their manufacture | [1990/30] | French: | Structures de caisses de véhicules et leur procédé de fabrication | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 01.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/30] | 22.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2050275 (FIAT RICERCHE) | [A] - Zeitschrift für Eisenbahnwesen und Verkehrstechnik. Glasers Annalen vol. 107, no. 1, January 1983, BERLIN DE pages 7 - 12; Gerhard Voss: "Leichtbau in der Schienenfahrzeugtechnik" |