EP0379348 - Windscreen wiper blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRICO-FOLBERTH LIMITED Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states TRICO-FOLBERTH LIMITED Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9HP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mower, Peter 9, Blandford Avenue, Whitton Twickenham, Middlesex / GB | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Pedder, James Cuthbert London Patent Operation General Electric International, Inc. 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Pedder, James Cuthbert J.C. Pedder & Co. 38 Norbury Cross Norbury London SW16 4JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300473.7 | 17.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | GB19890001148 | 19.01.1989 Original published format: GB 8901148 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379348 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379348 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38 | [1990/30] | CPC: |
B60S1/3806 (EP);
B60S1/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT [1990/30] | Title | German: | Scheibenwischerblatt | [1990/30] | English: | Windscreen wiper blade | [1990/30] | French: | Balai d'essuie-glace | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/12] | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Request for further processing for: | 21.10.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 09.11.1994 | ES | 09.11.1994 | FR | 09.11.1994 | IT | 09.11.1994 | DE | 10.02.1995 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 09.11.1994 | |
ES | 09.11.1994 | ||
IT | 09.11.1994 | ||
DE | 10.02.1995 | ||
FR | 07.04.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 09.11.1994 | |
IT | 09.11.1994 | ||
DE | 10.02.1995 | ||
FR | 07.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | BE | 09.11.1994 | |
DE | 10.02.1995 | ||
FR | 07.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | DE | 10.02.1995 | |
FR | 07.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | DE | 10.02.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0287464 (JOURNEE PAUL SA [FR]); | [A]EP0280806 (TRIDON LTD [CA]); | [A]DE2722135 (SUGIARTO SUGI) |