EP0379367 - Method for the prevention of intrinsically aged skin with retinoids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/30] | Method for the treatment or prevention of intrinsically aged skin with retinoids | ||
[1998/14] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 23.03.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORTHO PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION U.S. Route 202 P.O. Box 300 Raritan New Jersey 08869-0602 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | For all designated states ORTHO PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION U.S. Route 202 P.O. Box 300 Raritan New Jersey 08869-0602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kligman, Albert M. The Rittenhouse nr.3302 210 W. Rittenhouse Square Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 02 /
Mezick, James A. 43 Valley Forge Drive East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | 03 /
Capetola, Robert J. 21 Hidden Valley Drive, R.D. 2 Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300521.3 | 18.01.1990 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | US19890299119 | 19.01.1989 Original published format: US 299119 | CA19890588835 | 20.01.1989 Original published format: CA 588835 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0379367 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0379367 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379367 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48, A61K31/07, A61K31/19, A61K31/21 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/047 (EP);
A61K31/07 (EP);
A61K31/10 (EP);
A61K31/19 (EP);
A61K31/192 (EP);
A61K31/20 (EP);
A61K31/203 (EP);
A61K8/671 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/08 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1990/30] | A61K7/48, A61K31/595 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verhütung der Hautalterung mittels Retinoiden | [1998/14] | English: | Method for the prevention of intrinsically aged skin with retinoids | [1998/14] | French: | Méthode de prévention par des rétinoides de la peau âgée | [1998/14] |
Former [1990/30] | Verfahren zur Behandlung oder Verhütung der Hautalterung mittels Retinoiden | ||
Former [1990/30] | Method for the treatment or prevention of intrinsically aged skin with retinoids | ||
Former [1990/30] | Méthode de traitement ou de prévention par des rétinoides de la peau âgée | Miscellaneous | EPB 1998/14: (deleted) | EPB 1998/14: (deleted) | EPB 1998/14: (deleted) | EPB 1997/37: Teilanmeldung 97201923.6 eingereicht am 23/06/97 | EPB 1997/37: Divisional application 97201923.6 filed on 23/06/97 | EPB 1997/37: Demande divisionnaire 97201923.6 déposée le 23/06/97 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 27.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.1996 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 14.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 02.11.1993 | Appeal received No. T0067/94 | 07.01.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.12.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | EP97201923.6 / EP0815840 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1998
19.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02
22.12.1998
19.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 PARIS / FR Opponents representative Catherine, Alain Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, Rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1998
19.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02
22.12.1998
19.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 PARIS / FR Opponents representative Catherine, Alain Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2001/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1998
19.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patente, Marken und Lizenzen D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02
22.12.1998
19.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 PARIS / FR Opponents representative Catherine, Alain Cabinet Harlé & Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1999/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1998
19.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patente, Marken und Lizenzen D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
02
22.12.1998
19.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE L'OREAL 14, rue Royale 75008 PARIS / FR Opponents representative Renard, Emmanuelle (FR) L'OREAL Département Propriété Industrielle 6, rue Bertrand Sincholle F-92585 Clichy Cedex / FR | |||
Former [1999/05] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1998
19.01.1999
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft Patente, Marken und Lizenzen D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 12.02.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.08.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.11.2000 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2001/19] | 15.11.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.12.2000 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.12.2000 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Request for further processing for: | 29.07.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.08.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1466062 (KNIGHT K); | [X]EP0038246 (FABRE SA PIERRE [FR]); | [X]US4603146 (KLIGMAN ALBERT M [US]); | [X]WO8606275 (AVON PROD INC [US]); | [X]EP0229561 (MOET HENNESSY RECH [FR]); | [X]EP0253393 (KLIGMAN ALBERT M); | [X]EP0274104 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [X]FR2612775 (THOREL JEAN [FR]); | [X]WO8807857 (DALTEX MEDICAL SCIENCES INC [US]) |