EP0386873 - Cationic complexes of technetium 99m, and ligands therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERSHAM INTERNATIONAL plc Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states AMERSHAM INTERNATIONAL plc Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kelly, James Duncan 29 Highland Road Amersham, Buckinghamshire / GB | 02 /
Chiu, Kwok Wai 152 High Street Gloucester GL1 4YF / GB | 03 /
Griffiths, David Vaughan 23 Larchwood, University of Keele Keele, Staffordshire ST5 5BB / GB | 04 /
Dilworth, Jonathan Robin 8 Baronia Croft Highwoods, Colchester C04 4EE / GB | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300630.2 | 22.01.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | GB19890002362 | 03.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8902362 | [1990/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0386873 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0386873 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/02, C07F13/00 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
C07F13/005 (EP,US);
A61K51/0478 (EP,US);
A61K2123/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/37] | Title | German: | Kationische Komplexe von Technetium-99m und Liganden dafür | [1990/37] | English: | Cationic complexes of technetium 99m, and ligands therefor | [1990/37] | French: | Complexes cationiques de technetium-99m et ligands pour ces complexes | [1990/37] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 19.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.01.1994 | LU | 31.01.1994 | [2000/06] |
Former [1995/29] | AT | 22.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4430319 (BLAU MONTE [US], et al); | [A]EP0123240 (NEW ENGLAND NUCLEAR CORP [US]); | [XD]EP0201005 (UNIV CINCINNATI [US]) | Examination | EP0038756 | EP0119733 | EP0200492 |