EP0438840 - Camera for making collage photographs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOTOTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION Suite 3100, 100 Peachtree Street Atlanta, Georgia 30303 / US | [1991/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Edwin, M Barret 4055 Kelden Court, College Park Georgia 30349 / US | [1991/31] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1994/01] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | ||
Former [1991/31] | Hepworth, John Malcolm Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Street Corporation Street Rugby Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300659.1 | 22.01.1990 | [1991/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0438840 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0438840 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/12, G03B17/24 | [1991/31] | CPC: |
G03B17/12 (EP,US);
G03B17/24 (EP,US);
G03B2217/241 (EP,US);
G03B2217/248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [1991/40] |
Former [1991/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kamera zur Herstellung von Photocollagen | [1991/31] | English: | Camera for making collage photographs | [1991/31] | French: | Caméra pour créer des photocollages | [1991/31] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, DK, LU, SE | 24.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/13] | 23.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Request for further processing for: | 31.10.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 02.11.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.02.1991 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1991 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1991 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.02.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1995 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.1995 | 31.01.1996 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.10.1996 | CH | 02.10.1996 | ES | 02.10.1996 | GR | 02.10.1996 | IT | 02.10.1996 | LI | 02.10.1996 | NL | 02.10.1996 | GB | 22.01.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 02.10.1996 | |
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
ES | 02.10.1996 | ||
GR | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 02.10.1996 | |
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
GR | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 02.10.1996 | |
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
IT | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | BE | 02.10.1996 | |
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
GB | 22.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | BE | 02.10.1996 | |
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | CH | 02.10.1996 | |
LI | 02.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]US4896176 (BARRETT EDWIN M [US]); | [X]US4436400 (CHARIS PHILLIP S [US], et al); | [Y]US4764782 (WHEELER ALTON D [US]); | [Y]GB2208946 (BLANK ARTHUR); | [A]FR2573879 (BOUTONNET TRANIER DOMINIQUE [FR]); | [A]US3545849 (MIHELES AUREL) |