EP0380296 - Adaptive Apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinnaka, Shinji 553-1-M408, Shinanomachi, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Sato, Mikio 1-35-15, Nishirokugo, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Morisada, Masahiro 3-7-11, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300692.2 | 23.01.1990 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | JP19890016552 | 25.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1655289 | JP19890016553 | 25.01.1989 Original published format: JP 1655389 | [1990/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0380296 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0380296 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0380296 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
G05B13/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/31] | Title | German: | Selbstanpassende Vorrichtung | [1990/31] | English: | Adaptive Apparatus | [1990/31] | French: | Appareil adaptatif | [1990/31] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2042684 (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED) | [A] - ADVANCES IN INSTRUMENTATION. vol. 39, October 1984, PITTSBURGH US & T.J. SCHEIB: "A SELF-TUNING METHOD FOR SMITH PREDICTOR AND PID CONTROLS" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 27TH IEEE CONFERENCE ON DECISION AND CONTROL December 1988, AUSTIN US pages 745 - 750; A.S. MORSE: "TOWARDS A UNIFIED THEORY OF PARAMETER ADAPTIVE CONTROL" | Examination | - ADVANCES IN INSTRUMENTATION. vol. 39, October 1984, PITTSBURGH US pages 843 - 855; A. KAYA & T.J. SCHEIB: "A SELF-TUNING METHOD FOR SMITH PREDICTOR AND PID CONTROLS" |