EP0381408 - Magnetic disk drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 19.03.1997 [1997/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glaser, Thomas William Route 8, Box 183 Rochester, Minnesota 55902 / US | 02 /
Greenberg, Richard 748 Northern Hills Drive N.E. Rochester, Minnesota 55904 / US | 03 /
Misso, Nigel Frank 5714 Silas Dent Road N.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | 04 /
Schopp, Robert Ellsworth 2712 17th Avenue N.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55901 / US | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Moss, Robert Douglas IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90300884.5 | 29.01.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | US19890304996 | 31.01.1989 Original published format: US 304996 | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0381408 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/08 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
G11B33/121 (EP,US);
G11B25/043 (EP,US);
G11B33/08 (EP,US);
G11B33/1493 (EP,US);
G11B5/5578 (EP,US);
G11B5/4813 (EP,US);
Y10S360/903 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/32] | Title | German: | Gerät mit Magnetplatten | [1990/32] | English: | Magnetic disk drive | [1990/32] | French: | Tourne-disque magnétique | [1990/32] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/12] | 03.11.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.03.1991 | M01   Fee paid on   22.03.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0306715 [ ] (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | EP0176602 [ ] (SONY CORP [JP]); | EP0328260 [ ] (MDB SYSTEMS INC [US]); | DE3627451 [ ] (PRIAM CORP [US]) |