EP0381488 - Method for the recovery of black oil residues [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GREAT EASTERN (BERMUDA) LTD. 445 Fifth Avenue New York, New York 10016 / US | [1990/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ripley, Ian Stanley 75 The Willows Marton, Middlesbrough, Cleveland TS7 8BP / GB | 02 /
Needham, Antony H 50 Thames Avenue Guisborough, Cleveland / GB | [1990/32] | Representative(s) | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301041.1 | 01.02.1990 | [1990/32] | Priority number, date | GB19890002116 | 01.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8902116 | [1990/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0381488 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0381488 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0381488 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B08B9/08 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
B08B9/0933 (EP,US);
Y10T137/0391 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/32] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Wiedergewinnung von Schwarzölrückständen | [1990/32] | English: | Method for the recovery of black oil residues | [1990/32] | French: | Méthode de récupération des résidus d'huile noire | [1990/32] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 27.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB992614 (F A HUGHES & COMPANY LTD); | [A]FR1592810 ; | [A]EP0032813 (EMULTEC LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2518964 (TAIHO IND CO [JP]); | [A]FR2546085 (GRAFFEO ALPHONSE [FR]); | [A]GB2165141 (URBANI WILLIAM G); | [A]EP0273463 (ARFAZ EQUIPMENT [NL]) |