EP0382458 - Means for securing a container to a support surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.1992 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEORGE BLAIR PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Pottery Lane Forth Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 3RB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states GEORGE BLAIR PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Pottery Lane Forth Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 3RB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reynard, Kenneth The Den, 13D Croft Head Thirsk, North Yorkshire / GB | [1990/33] | Representative(s) | Sanderson, Michael John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | Sanderson, Michael John, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301194.8 | 05.02.1990 | [1990/33] | Priority number, date | GB19890002875 | 09.02.1989 Original published format: GB 8902875 | [1990/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0382458 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/13 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
B65D90/0013 (EP);
B60P7/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/33] | Title | German: | Mittel zum Sichern eines Transportbehälters auf einer Auflagefläche | [1990/33] | English: | Means for securing a container to a support surface | [1990/33] | French: | Moyens pour consolider un container sur une surface d'appui | [1990/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/41] | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/41] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2060840 [ ]; | US4382735 [ ] |