EP0383591 - Use of 5-methyl-1-phenyl-2-(1H)-pyridone in the prevention of fibrotic lesions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/34] | Use of 5-methyl-1-phenyl-2-(1H)-pyridone in the prevention and treatment of fibrotic lesions | ||
[2000/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamauchi, Shitotomo c/o KDL INC., Central Bldg. Ichibancho 22-1 Chiyoda Tokyo 102 / JP | For all designated states MARGOLIN, Solomon B. 6723 Desco Drive Dallas, Texas 75225 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | For all designated states Yamauchi, Shitotomo c/o KDL INC., Central Bldg. Ichibancho 22-1 Chiyoda, Tokyo 102 / JP | ||
For all designated states MARGOLIN, Solomon B. 6723 Desco Drive Dallas, Texas 75225 / US | |||
Former [1990/34] | For all designated states Yamauchi, Shitotomo c/o KDL INC., Central Bldg. Ichibancho 22-1 Chiyoda, Tokyo 102 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Margolin, Solmon B. c/o.MARNAC Inc.,6723 Desco Drive Dallas, Texas 75225 / US | [2001/47] |
Former [1990/34] | 01 /
Margolin, Solmon B. c/o Timothy Medical Sciences Company, Inc., 11, Lewis Road Trumbull - Connecticut 06611 / US | Representative(s) | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | Bannerman, David Gardner, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1995/35] | Baker, Colin John, et al Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1994/35] | Arthur, Bryan Edward Withers & Rogers 4 Dyers Buildings Holborn London, EC1N 2JT / GB | ||
Former [1990/34] | Silveston, Judith ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301607.9 | 15.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | JP19890035436 | 15.02.1989 Original published format: JP 3543689 | [1990/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0383591 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0383591 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0383591 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/4412 (EP);
A61K31/44 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/34] | Title | German: | Verwendung von 5-methyl-1-phenyl-2-(1H)-pyridon zur Vorbeugung fibrotischer Schädigungen | [2000/45] | English: | Use of 5-methyl-1-phenyl-2-(1H)-pyridone in the prevention of fibrotic lesions | [2000/45] | French: | Utilisation de la 5-méthyl-1-phényl-2-(1H)-pyridone pour la prévention des lésions fibrotiques | [2000/45] |
Former [1990/34] | Verwendung von 5-methyl-1-phenyl-2-(1H)-pyridon zur Vorbeugung und Behandlung der fibrotischen Schädigungen | ||
Former [1990/34] | Use of 5-methyl-1-phenyl-2-(1H)-pyridone in the prevention and treatment of fibrotic lesions | ||
Former [1990/34] | Utilisation de la 5-méthyl-1-phényl-2-(1H)-pyridone pour la prévention et le traitement des lésions fibrotiques | Examination procedure | 02.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/34] | 30.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.05.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01107235.2 / EP1138329 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4042699 (GADEKAR SHREEKRISHNA M) | [X] - FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, FED. PROC., New Orleans, Louisiana, 15th - 23rd April 1982, vol. 41, no. 5, abstract no. 7480; S. MARGOLIN et al.: "Removal of interstitial Pulmonary fibrosis (asbestos-induced) by oral chemotherapy with pirfenidone" | [A] - DRUGS OF THE FUTURE, vol. 11, no. 6, June 1977, pages 396-397; P.J. ROBERTS et al.: "Pirfenidone" |