EP0385632 - Preparation of oxetane polyether polyols [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.12.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARCO Chemical Technology, L.P. Two Greenville Crossing, 4001 Kennett Pike, Suite 238 Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states ARCO Chemical Technology, L.P. Two Greenville Crossing 4001 Kennett Pike, Suite 238 Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US | ||
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states ARCO CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. 3 Christina Centre Suite 902 201 N Walnut Street Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuchardt, Jonathan L. 121 Princeton Road Exton, Pennsylvania 19341 / US | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Cropp, John Anthony David, et al MATHYS & SQUIRE 100 Grays Inn Road London, WC1X 8AL / GB | [1990/36] | Application number, filing date | 90301770.5 | 19.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | US19890315956 | 27.02.1989 Original published format: US 315956 | [1990/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0385632 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0385632 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/18, C08G65/32 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
C08G65/18 (EP,US);
C08G65/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL [1990/36] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Oxetanpolyetherpolyolen | [1990/36] | English: | Preparation of oxetane polyether polyols | [1990/36] | French: | Préparation de polyols de polyéthers oxétaniques | [1990/36] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 05.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/04] | 11.09.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4034015 (HEDRICK ROSS M, et al); | [A]DE2817366 (DU PONT); | [AP]EP0307811 (BASF AG [DE]); | [A]EP0219857 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) |