EP0385674 - Toner image transferring device used in electrophotographic field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Masatoshi Annekkusu Miyata 101, 320, Kamigo Ebina-shi, Kanagawa 243-04 / JP | 02 /
Iwasaki, Hideaki 1687, Nakanoshima, Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 214 / JP | 03 /
Sasaki, Sachio 3-2-4, Nagatsuda, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227 / JP | 04 /
Sato, Kunihiko Purejiru 202, 874-3, Yotsuya Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228 / JP | 05 /
Konishi, Masao 2-41-10, Kuboyama-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 192 / JP | 06 /
Iwamasa, Akiyoshi 4068-31, Kokubu Ebina-shi, Kanagawa 243 / JP | 07 /
Tooda, Toshio Mezoneito 101, 15-4, Chitoseshinmachi Takatu-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213 / JP | 08 /
Nou, Hiroshi 12-45, Edanishi 1-chome, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227 / JP | 09 /
Utaka, Shigenobu 30, Shimokodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 10 /
Kitao, Ryo 2289-13, Imajyuku-cho, Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 241 / JP | [1990/36] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90301970.1 | 23.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | JP19890044367 | 25.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4436789 | JP19890044368 | 25.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4436889 | JP19890044369 | 25.02.1989 Original published format: JP 4436989 | [1990/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0385674 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0385674 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0385674 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/16 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
G03G15/1645 (EP);
G03G15/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/36] | Title | German: | Tonerbildübertragungsvorrichtung, nutzbar auf elektrophotographischem Gebiet | [1990/36] | English: | Toner image transferring device used in electrophotographic field | [1990/36] | French: | Dispositif de transfert d'une image à tour utile dans le champ électrophotographique | [1990/36] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 02.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP1201686 ; | [A]JP5882282 ; | [A]JP61188570 ; | [A]US4728991 (TAKAYAMA KENZO [JP], et al); | [A]US4772918 (KARASAWA KAZUNORI [JP], et al); | [A]US4183653 (KUDOH KUNIO [JP], et al) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 502 (P-958)(3850), 13 November 1989; & JP - A - 1201686 (RICOH) 14.08.1989, & JP1201686 A 19891113 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 180 (P-215)(1325), 9 August 1983; & JP - A - 5882282 (CANON) 17.05.1983, & JP5882282 A 19830809 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 12 (P-535)(2459), 13 January 1987; & JP - A - 61188570 (CANON) 22.08.1986, & JP61188570 A 19870113 |