EP0386935 - Apparatus capable of varying number of wait states for access [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.11.1996 [1996/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimura, Akihiro 31-4 Minami Kugahara 2-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302164.0 | 28.02.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | JP19890057303 | 08.03.1989 Original published format: JP 5730389 | [1990/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0386935 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0386935 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0386935 | Date: | 22.11.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/42 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
G06F13/4243 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/37] | Title | German: | Gerät, das fähig ist, die Anzahl von Wartezuständen für den Zugriff zu variieren | [1990/37] | English: | Apparatus capable of varying number of wait states for access | [1990/37] | French: | Appareil capable de varier le nombre d'états d'attente pour accès | [1990/37] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 10.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2388342 (INT COMPUTERS LTD [GB]) | [A] - WESCON/87 CONFERENCE RECORD, vol. 31, 1987, pages 18/4 (1-8), Los Angeles, CA, US; R.J. JIGOUR et al.: "Peel device architectures enhance microprocessor system logic applications" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 24, no. 12, May 1982, pages 6256-6257, New York, US; P.A. BEAVEN et al.: "Matching processor timing sequence to different memories" |