EP0388051 - Technique for converting either way between a plurality of N synchronized serial bit streams and a parallel TDM format [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1990/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baylock, Gerald Anthony 178 Idlebrook Lane Aberdeen, New Jersey 07747 / US | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302254.9 | 02.03.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | US19890325614 | 13.03.1989 Original published format: US 325614 | [1990/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0388051 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0388051 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388051 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04, H03M9/00 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
H04Q11/04 (EP,US);
G06F3/00 (KR);
G06F13/38 (KR);
H04J3/047 (EP,US);
H04L25/05 (EP,US);
H04L5/245 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13036 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13214 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13292 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Umwandlung in beiden Richtungen zwischen mehreren N-synchronen seriellen Bitströmen und einem parallelen Zeitmultiplex-Format | [1990/38] | English: | Technique for converting either way between a plurality of N synchronized serial bit streams and a parallel TDM format | [1990/38] | French: | Technique de conversion bidirectionnelle entre une pluralité de N trains de données synchronisés en série et un format parallèle de multiplexage temporel | [1995/49] |
Former [1990/38] | Technique de conversion bidirectionnelle entre plusieurs de N trains de données synchronisés en série et en format parallèle de multiplexage temporel | Examination procedure | 01.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2359562 (LABO CENT TELECOMMUNICAT [FR]); | [Y]FR2373935 (LABO CENT TELECOMMUNICAT [FR]); | [A]EP0241959 (AT & T & PHILIPS TELECOMM [NL]); | [X]FR2225898 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) |