EP0444339 - Multi-layer heat-sealable polypropylene films [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.04.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Oil Corporation 150 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/44] | For all designated states EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | ||
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balloni, Riccardo 41 Georgetown Lane Fairport, New York 14450 / US | 02 /
Donovan, Kevin Michael 64 Harvest Lane Milford, Connecticut 06460 / US | 03 /
Keung, Jay Kin 6011 Allen Padgham Road Macedon, New York 14502 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1994/35] | Colmer, Stephen Gary, et al European Office of Patent Counsel Mobil House 500-600 Witan Gate Central Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK9 1ES / GB | ||
Former [1991/36] | Colmer, Stephen Gary Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 50-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302275.4 | 02.03.1990 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444339 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444339 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/18, B32B27/32 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/18 (US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
C09J7/22 (EP,US);
C09J7/35 (EP,US);
B32B2307/31 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2327/00 (US);
B32B2439/70 (US);
C09J2301/162 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/36] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige, heisssiegelbare Polypropylenfilme | [1991/36] | English: | Multi-layer heat-sealable polypropylene films | [1991/36] | French: | Pellicule multicouche thermosoudable en polypropylène | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 12.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.09.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.1999
04.05.1999
ADMISSIBLE Trespaphan GmbH & Co. KG Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Mai, Oppermann & Partner i.L., et al, et al Patentanwälte Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.1999
04.05.1999
ADMISSIBLE Trespaphan GmbH Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR, et al, et al Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1999/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.1999
Hoechst Trespaphan GmbH Bergstrasse 66539 Neunkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR, et al, et al Patentanwälte, Postfach 3929 65029 Wiesbaden / DE | 04.06.1999 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.12.1999 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.11.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M08) | 02.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 13.04.2003 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2003/23] | Appeal following opposition | 03.09.2002 | Appeal received No. T0897/02 | 04.11.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 27.03.2003 | Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST | Request for further processing for: | 07.08.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 07.08.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.08.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 31.03.1999 | AT | 02.03.2001 | LU | 02.03.2001 | SE | 03.03.2001 | GR | 31.03.2001 | [2007/30] |
Former [2004/09] | DK | 31.03.1999 | |
AT | 02.03.2001 | ||
SE | 03.03.2001 | ||
GR | 31.03.2001 | ||
Former [2003/45] | DK | 31.03.1999 | |
AT | 02.03.2001 | ||
SE | 03.03.2001 | ||
GR | 09.02.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 02.03.2001 | |
SE | 03.03.2001 | ||
GR | 09.02.2002 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 02.03.2001 | |
SE | 03.03.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 03.03.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4230767 (ISAKA TSUTOMU, et al); | [A]US4419410 (WEINER MILTON L [US]); | [A]EP0211433 (HERCULES INC [US]); | [A]EP0263963 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]DE3735272 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0275889 (HOECHST AG [DE]) | Examination | EP0411968 |