EP0400780 - Microlithographic method for producing thick, vertically-walled photoresist patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard Massachusetts 01754-1418 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard Massachusetts 01754-1418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sidman, Alan Lee 29 Leewood Road Wellesley, Massachusetts 02181 / US | 02 /
Fung, Susan Kit 381 Lake Avenue Worcester, Massachusetts 01604 / US | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302628.4 | 13.03.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | US19890360522 | 02.06.1989 Original published format: US 360522 | [1990/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0400780 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/027, G03F7/00, G03B41/00 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
G11B5/3163 (EP,US);
G03F7/091 (EP,US);
H01F41/34 (EP,US);
H01L21/0274 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/49] | Title | German: | Mikrolithographisches Verfahren für die Herstellung dicker Fororesistmuster mit vertikalen Wänden | [1990/49] | English: | Microlithographic method for producing thick, vertically-walled photoresist patterns | [1990/49] | French: | Méthode microlithographique pour produire des motifs en photorésist épais et à parois verticales | [1990/49] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 20.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/43] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING | [Y] - MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING | [X] - IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS | [Y] - NTIS TECHNICAL NOTES | [X] - JOURNAL OF IMAGING SCIENCE | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | [A] - LASER & OPTOELEKTRONIK |