EP0388190 - Rail pads and methods of upgrading railway track using such pads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK, NL | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PANDROL LIMITED 63 Station Road, Addlestone Weybridge Surrey KT15 2BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states PANDROL LIMITED 63 Station Road, Addlestone Weybridge, Surrey KT15 2BH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Leeves, Geoffrey Gordon 166a Ashford Road Bearsted, Kent ME14 4NB / GB | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302747.2 | 15.03.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | GB19890005917 | 15.03.1989 Original published format: GB 8905917 | [1990/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0388190 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388190 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E01B9/68 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
E01B9/686 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/49] |
Former [1990/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Schienenunterlagen und Verfahren zur Verbesserung von Eisenbahngleisen unter Verwendung solcher Unterlagen | [1990/38] | English: | Rail pads and methods of upgrading railway track using such pads | [1990/38] | French: | Semelles pour rails, et méthode de modification de voies de chemin de fer utilisant de telles semelles | [1990/38] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1990 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GB, GR, LU | 19.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 09.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Request for further processing for: | 12.08.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 26.08.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.09.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.05.1990 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.1990 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.05.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.1993 | CH | 28.07.1993 | DE | 28.07.1993 | DK | 28.07.1993 | LI | 28.07.1993 | NL | 28.07.1993 | [1998/15] |
Former [1994/22] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
CH | 28.07.1993 | ||
DE | 28.07.1993 | ||
LI | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/19] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
CH | 28.07.1993 | ||
LI | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/05] | CH | 28.07.1993 | |
LI | 28.07.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7718527U ; | [A]GB2094377 (ARUN PLASTICS LTD, et al); | [Y]EP0169685 (PANDROL LTD [GB]); | [Y]EP0236703 (CLOUTH GUMMIWERKE AG [DE]) |