EP0389184 - Electronic information processing method and device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states HITACHI PROCESS COMPUTER ENGINEERING, INC. 2-1, Oomikacho-5-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | ||
For all designated states HITACHI PROCESS COMPUTER ENGINEERING, INC. 2-1, Oomikacho-5-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimoto, Koichi 12-5 Mikanohara-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Toshihiro 18-5 Makamura-cho 2-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 03 /
Oshima, Keiji 3449-10 Higashiishikawa Katsuta-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | 04 /
Oda, Yukihiro 2929-137 Mawatari Katsuta-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | 05 /
Sekine, Akira 1614-13 Oomori-cho Hitachioota-shi, Ibaraki 313 / JP | 06 /
Higashihara, Toshiaki 3230-2 Mayumi-cho Hitachioota-shi, Ibaraki 313 / JP | 07 /
Seki, Kouhei 5-18 Tajiri-cho 1-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319-14 / JP | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302788.6 | 15.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | JP19890066210 | 20.03.1989 Original published format: JP 6621089 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389184 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389184 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/14, G06F17/30 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
G06F16/40 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2113 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/39] | G06F12/14, G06F15/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur elektronischen Datenverarbeitung | [1990/39] | English: | Electronic information processing method and device | [1990/39] | French: | Méthode et appareil de traitement électronique de données | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/39] | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.08.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0010186 (IBM [US]); | [X]EP0130218 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0192243 (HONEYWELL INC [US]); | [Y]EP0262025 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 25, no. 11A, April 1983, NEW YORK US pages 5474 - 5476; S.M. Jennings et al.: "AUTHORIZATION CHECK FUNCTION" |