EP0393840 - Hydrogen peroxide stabilization in assays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEMTRAK, INC. 484 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states CHEMTRAK, INC. 484 Oakmead Parkway Sunnyvale California 94086 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allen, Michael Patrick 677 West Garland Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | 02 /
Li, Sheng-Fen 896 Valencia Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [1995/28] |
Former [1990/43] | 01 /
Allen, Michael Patrick 677 West Garland Terrace Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | ||
02 /
Li, Sheng-Fen 896 Valencia Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/06] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1990/43] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward MEWBURN ELLIS 2 Cursitor Street London EC4A 1BQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302845.4 | 16.03.1990 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | US19890325448 | 17.03.1989 Original published format: US 325448 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0393840 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0393840 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0393840 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/28, C12Q1/26, C12Q1/60, C12Q1/54 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
C12Q1/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/28] |
Former [1990/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Stabilisierung von Wasserstoffsuperoxyd in Tests | [1990/43] | English: | Hydrogen peroxide stabilization in assays | [1990/43] | French: | Stabilisation de peroxyde d'hydrogène dans des essais | [1990/43] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 21.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.08.1992 | M01   Fee paid on   21.08.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 16.03.1996 | [1997/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0071730 ; | [A]EP0265381 ; | [A]EP0292727 ; | [AD]EP0296826 ; | [AP]EP0342447 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 78, no. 20, 21 May 1973, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 128841C, A. KRAUSE ET AL.: 'Catalytic activity of some ions in sodium nitroprusside solutions.' page 299 ;column 2 ;& Rocz. Chem., vol. 46, no. 10, 1972, pages 1901-1903 | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 78, no. 20, 21 May 1973, Columbus, OH (US);A. KRAUSE et al., p. 299, no. 128841c/ |