EP0389220 - An acceleration device for charged particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirota, Junichi Ayukawadai-Apt. 15-302, 2-4 Ayukawa-cho Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 316 / JP | 02 /
Nishi, Masatsugu 843-18 Nakane Katsuta-shi, Ibaraki 312 / JP | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1990/39] | Calderbank, Thomas Roger MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302928.8 | 19.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | JP19890066225 | 20.03.1989 Original published format: JP 6622589 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0389220 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0389220 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H05H7/00, H05H7/02 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
H05H7/02 (EP,US);
H05H7/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/39] | Title | German: | Beschleunigungsvorrichtung für geladene Teilchen | [1990/39] | English: | An acceleration device for charged particles | [1990/39] | French: | Dispositif pour accélérer des particules chargées | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/39] | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/36] | 08.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/36] | Request for further processing for: | 03.04.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.04.1997 | Decision despatched | 11.08.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 15.09.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 28.09.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JPH01281700 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) | [XP] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE PARTICLE ACCELERATOR CONFERENCE vol. 1, 23 March 1989, NEW YORK pages 193 - 195; DOWLING D T ET AL: "RF CAVITY FOR THE HISTRAP ACCELERATOR" | [A] - NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION A vol. A244, no. 1/2, February 1986, AMSTERDAM pages 180 - 182; SCHÖDLBAUER ET AL: "A SIMPLE SUBNANOSECOND HIGH ENERGY BUNCHER FOR THE MUNICH MP-TANDEM" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE. vol. 30, no. 4, August 1983, NEW YORK US pages 3499 - 3501; J M BAILLOD ET AL: "A SECOND HARMONIC (6-16 MHZ) RF SYSTEM WITH FEEDBACK-REDUCED GAP IMPEDANCE FOR ACCELERATING FLAT-TOPPED BUNCHES IN THE CERN PS BOOSTER" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE PARTICLE ACCELERATOR CONFERENCE vol. 3, 19 March 1987, NEW YORK pages 1901 - 1903; B J EVANS ET AL: "THE 1 MEV 114 MHZ ELECTRON ACCELERATING SYSTEM FOR THE CERN PS" |