EP0389225 - Axis indicator for orthodontic bracket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1994 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS, INC. 501 George Street New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS, INC. 501 George Street New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bolliger, Diane K. 10615 Dabney Drive, Apartment 21 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 02 /
Graham, Howard 6345 Blanchard Road La Mesa, CA 92042 / US | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 90302935.3 | 19.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | US19890325744 | 20.03.1989 Original published format: US 325744 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389225 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389225 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/12 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
A61C7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/39] | Title | German: | Achsenanzeiger für orthodontische Klammern | [1990/39] | English: | Axis indicator for orthodontic bracket | [1990/39] | French: | Indicateur d'axe pour agrafes orthodontiques | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 10.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4523908 (DRISALDI GIOVANNI [IT], et al); | [A]DE3541506 (HARODENT KFO DENTAL VERTRIEB G [DE]); | [A]EP0290247 (ORMCO CORP [US]); | [A]US4799882 (KESLING PETER C [US]) |