EP0389255 - Process for producing molybdenum bismuth-containing metal oxide catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. No. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasaki, Yutaka, c/o Nitto Chemical Ind. Co. Ltd. 10, Daikoku-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Mori, Kunio, c/o Nitto Chemical Ind. Co. Ltd. 10, Daikoku-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Moriya, Kiyoshi, c/o Nitto Chemical Ind. Co. Ltd. 10, Daikoku-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Pearce, Anthony Richmond, et al MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303013.8 | 21.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | JP19890069371 | 23.03.1989 Original published format: JP 6937189 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389255 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389255 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/31, B01J23/88, B01J23/89, B01J27/192 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
B01J23/002 (EP,US);
B01J23/31 (EP,US);
B01J23/88 (EP,US);
B01J23/8885 (EP,US);
B01J23/8892 (EP,US);
B01J27/192 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/22, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/27, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/305, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/3706, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/3712, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/44, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/51, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/51, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/64, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/53, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/69, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/67, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (EP,US);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/72, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/847 (US,EP);
B01J2523/00, B01J2523/13, B01J2523/41, B01J2523/54, B01J2523/68, B01J2523/842, B01J2523/845 (US,EP)
(-) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1990/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines die Metalloxide von Molybdän und Wismut enthaltenden Katalysators | [1990/39] | English: | Process for producing molybdenum bismuth-containing metal oxide catalyst | [1990/39] | French: | Procédé de production d'un catalyseur contenant des oxydes métalliques de molybdène et de bismuth | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 24.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1945470 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE); | [A]GB1263139 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]FR2117225 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [YD]US3984477 (KUBO MASAYOCHI, et al); | [YD]US4418007 (DERRIEN JEAN-YVES [FR]) | Examination | EP0194516 |