EP0389271 - Matching sequences of labels representing input data and stored data utilising dynamic programming [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.12.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.1996 | Refusal of application | published on 05.02.1997 [1997/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itoh, Nobuyasu Rejidensu Wakoh 302goh, 27-1 Shimosakunobe Takatsu-ku, Tawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Atchley, Martin John Waldegrave IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Atchley, Martin John Waldegrave IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303058.3 | 21.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | JP19890070442 | 24.03.1989 Original published format: JP 7044289 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0389271 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0389271 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/68, G06F15/40 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
G06F16/9027 (EP,US);
G06F16/90344 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/39] | G06F15/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/39] | Title | German: | Vergleich von Etikettfolgen, die Eingabedaten und gespeicherte Daten darstellen, mit Benutzung dynamischer Programmierung | [1990/39] | English: | Matching sequences of labels representing input data and stored data utilising dynamic programming | [1990/39] | French: | Comparaison de suites d'étiquettes représentant des données d'entrée et des données mémorisées utilisant la programmation dynamique | [1990/39] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 13.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 02.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/06] | 16.09.1996 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1996 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3593903 [ ] (ASTAFIEV GEORGY VASILIEVICH, et al); | GB1352554 [ ] (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP); | GB1452185 [ ] (WOLF GMBH RICHARD); | GB2048685 [ ] (WOLF GMBH RICHARD); | US4784137 [ ] (KULIK YAROSLAV P [SU], et al); | EP0369324 [ ] (SALIS SKER JEAN RODOLPHE DE) | [L] - SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS IN JAPAN vol. 20, no. 11, November 1989, NEW YORK pages 33 - 44; SAKOE H. ET AL: 'A high-speed DP-matching algorithm based on fram synchronization, beam search and vector quantization' |