EP0390613 - Absorbable surgical fastener with bone penetrating elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | ||
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORPORATION 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06850 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sander, Thomas W. 71 High Rock Road Newtown, CT 06482 / US | 02 /
White, Jeffrey S. 49, Nutmeg Ridge Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US | [1991/05] |
Former [1990/40] | 01 /
Sander, Thomas W. 71 High Rock Drive Newtown, CT 06482 / US | Representative(s) | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/44] | Marsh, Roy David, et al Hoffmann Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/40] | Marsh, Roy David Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Midsummer House 411C Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303523.6 | 02.04.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | US19890332355 | 31.03.1989 Original published format: US 332355 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0390613 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390613 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/08, A61B17/064 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
A61B17/0642 (EP);
A61B17/68 (EP);
A61B2017/00004 (EP);
A61B2017/0647 (EP);
A61B2017/0648 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/40] | Title | German: | Absorbierbare chirurgische Klammer mit knochendurchdringenden Elementen | [1990/40] | English: | Absorbable surgical fastener with bone penetrating elements | [1990/40] | French: | Agrafe chirurgicale résorbable avec éléments pénétrant dans un os | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 17.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0346033 ; | [YD]EP0127994 ; | [Y]EP0273872 ; | [Y]EP0283127 ; | [A]DE2721075 | Examination | US3739773 | US3797499 |