EP0392719 - Optical coupling arrangements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.1992 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC-MARCONI LIMITED The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/10] | For all designated states GEC-MARCONI LIMITED The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore, Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | ||
Former [1990/42] | For all designated states PLESSEY OVERSEAS LIMITED Vicarage Lane Ilford Essex IG1 4AQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Randle, Frederick Arthur 11 Willows Hill Bradden, Nr. Towcester, Northants / GB | 02 /
Carter, Andrew C. 32A Stoke Road Blisworth, Northants / GB | [1992/04] |
Former [1990/42] | 01 /
Randle, Frederick Arthur 11 Willows Hill Bradden, Nr. Towcester, Northants / GB | ||
02 /
* * * | Representative(s) | Pope, Michael Bertram Wingate, et al The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1991/15] |
Former [1991/10] | Nicholson, Ronald The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | ||
Former [1990/42] | Lupton, Frederick The General Electric Company, p.l.c., Central Patent Department, Hirst Research Centre Wembley, Middlesex, HA9 7PP / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303526.9 | 02.04.1990 | [1990/42] | Priority number, date | GB19890007958 | 08.04.1989 Original published format: GB 8907958 | [1990/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0392719 | Date: | 17.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0392719 | Date: | 06.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/45] | Type: | A1 / A2 RE Reissue of A-publication | No.: | EP0392719 | Date: | 24.03.1992 | [1992/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42, G02B6/32 | [1990/42] | CPC: |
G02B6/4204 (EP);
G02B6/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/42] | Title | German: | Optische Kopplungsanordnungen | [1990/42] | English: | Optical coupling arrangements | [1990/42] | French: | Dispositifs de couplage optiques | [1990/42] | File destroyed: | 15.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 07.05.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/02] | 12.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.06.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0259018 ; | [Y]US4616899 ; | [X]EP0094710 ; | [A]US4563057 |