EP0391687 - Treatment of alcoholic beverages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
NL
JOSEPH CROSFIELD & SONS LTD. P O Box 26, Bank Quay Warrington Cheshire, WA5 1AB / GB | For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
SE
AT
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For:GB
NL
JOSEPH CROSFIELD & SONS LTD. P O Box 26, Bank Quay Warrington, Cheshire, WA5 1AB / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
SE
AT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | |||
Former [1990/41] | For:GB
NL
JOSEPH CROSFIELD & SONS LTD. P O Box 26, Bank Quay Warrington, Cheshire, WA5 1AB / GB | ||
For:BE
CH
DE
DK
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
SE
AT
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernyhough, Robert 12 Upton Drive Penketh, Warrington Cheshire / GB | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Roscoe, Brian Corrie UNILEVER PLC Patents Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Roscoe, Brian Corrie UNILEVER PLC Patents Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303613.5 | 04.04.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | GB19890007813 | 06.04.1989 Original published format: GB 8907813 | [1990/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0391687 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0391687 | Date: | 10.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12H1/04, B01D39/00 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
C12H1/0408 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | Behandlung von alkoholischen Getränken | [1990/41] | English: | Treatment of alcoholic beverages | [1990/41] | French: | Traitement des boissons alcoolisées | [1990/41] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 07.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.08.1994 | BE | 10.08.1994 | GR | 10.08.1994 | IT | 10.08.1994 | SE | 10.11.1994 | CH | 30.04.1995 | LI | 30.04.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
GR | 10.08.1994 | ||
IT | 10.08.1994 | ||
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
IT | 10.08.1994 | ||
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
SE | 10.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/26] | AT | 10.08.1994 | |
BE | 10.08.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 10.08.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH366516 (BRITISH FILTERS LIMITED [GB]); | [Y]DE2323487 (AKZO CHEMIE GMBH); | [Y]FR2454324 (DAICEL LTD) |