EP0391730 - Method of and device for printer control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.1995 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.1995 [1995/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanuma, Jiro, c/o Oki Electric Industry Co., Ltd. 7-12 Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Ishimizu, Hideaki, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12 Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kasai, Tadashi, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12 Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Komori, Chihiro, c/o Oki Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. 7-12 Toranomon 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90303713.3 | 06.04.1990 | [1990/41] | Priority number, date | JP19890087093 | 07.04.1989 Original published format: JP 8709389 | [1990/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0391730 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0391730 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0391730 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41J11/42, B41J19/14, B41J19/18 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
B41J19/145 (EP,US);
B41J19/202 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/41] | B41J11/42 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Steuerung eines Druckers | [1990/41] | English: | Method of and device for printer control | [1990/41] | French: | Méthode et dispositif de commande d'une imprimante | [1990/41] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 04.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP587386 ; | [A]JP59124881 ; | [A]JP60248379 ; | [A]US4210404 (HANGER WILLIAM A [US]); | [A]US4600319 (EVERETT JR SETH L [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 81 (M-205)(1226) 5 April 1983, & JP-A-58 7386 (TATARA) 17 January 1983,, & JP587386 A 19830117 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 249 (M-338)(1686) 15 November 1984, & JP-A-59 124881 (ABE) 19 July 1984,, & JP59124881 A 19840719 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 118 (M-475)(2175) 2 May 1986, & JP-A-60 248379 (WATANABE) 9 December 1985,, & JP60248379 A 19851209 |